Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994496

EP0994496 - Rotary cam switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DREEFS GmbH Schaltgeräte und Systeme
Ernst-Dreefs-Strasse 7
96364 Marktrodach / DE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Krüger, Notburga
Am Steig 87
96364 Marktrodach / DE
02 / Imer, Klaus
Im Ziegelwinkel 39
96317 Kronach / DE
03 / Haschkamp, Joachim
Ernst-Dreefs-Strasse 3
96364 Marktrodach / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Koch, Günther , et al
Patentanwälte
Wallach, Koch, Dr.Haibach, Feldkamp
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Koch, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118415.117.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE1998218196U12.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29818196 U
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994496
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01H19/62
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesRO06.10.1999
SI06.10.1999
TitleGerman:Nockendrehschalter[2000/16]
English:Rotary cam switch[2000/16]
French:Commutateur rotatif à cames[2000/16]
Examination procedure31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
03.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
17.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2001
30.09.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0860846  (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 8, line 26 - column 11, line 50; figures 1-4,9 * [A] 4-11;
 [XA]DE3618312  (BAER ELEKTROWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-5 * [A] 4-11;
 [XA]US3831272  (PURDY H) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 11; figures 1-4; claim 1 * [A] 4-11