Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990838

EP0990838 - Lamp for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hella KGaA Hueck & Co.
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59552 Lippstadt / DE
[2004/48]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Hella KG Hueck & Co.
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59552 Lippstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mügge, Martin
Am Feldbach 40
59590 Geseke / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date99118501.818.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814459429.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844594
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990838
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990838
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990838
Date:17.05.2006
Language:DE
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/10, F21V5/00, F21V7/00
[2002/36]
Former International [2000/14]F21S8/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leuchte für Kraftfahrzeuge[2000/14]
English:Lamp for motor vehicles[2000/14]
French:Lampe pour véhicules automobiles[2000/14]
Examination procedure23.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
07.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2006Fee for grant paid
11.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB17.05.2006
[2007/30]
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2285121  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 12 * * page 4, line 28 - page 4, line 30 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 16 * * figures 4-13 *;
 [A]EP0531960  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0742409  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *
by applicantEP0489123
 EP0472890
 DE3305218
 DE4241887