Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969309

EP0969309 - Set of progressive spectacle lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Optische Werke G. Rodenstock
Isartalstrasse 43
80469 München / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Altheimer, Helmut
An der Halde
87650 Lauchdorf / DE
02 / Awrath, Norbert
Bayerischzeller Strasse 27
81539 München / DE
03 / Barth, Rudolf
Weichserstrasse 21a
85256 Vierkirchen / DE
04 / Baumbach, Peter
Schönstrasse 20
81543 München / DE
05 / Brosig, Jochen
Hirtenweg 9
82031 Grünwald / DE
06 / Esser, Gregor
Brunnenstrasse 1
85540 Haar / DE
07 / Füss, Monika
Adlzreiterstrasse 9
80337 München / DE
08 / Guilino, Günther
Kriegelsteinerstrasse 3
81476 München / DE
09 / Haimerl, Walter
Thalkirchnerstrasse 78a
80337 München / DE
10 / Meixner, Christine
Volkartstrasse 30
80634 München / DE
11 / Pfeiffer, Herbert
Georg-Hahn-Strasse 16
81247 München / DE
12 / Rohrbach, Manfred
Dorfstrasse 22
85241 Hebertshausen / DE
[2000/21]
Former [2000/01]01 / Altheimer, Helmut
Waldweg 17
80469 München / DE
02 / Awrath, Norbert
Bayerischzeller Strasse 27
81539 München / DE
03 / Barth, Rudolf
Weichserstrasse 21a
85256 Vierkirchen / DE
04 / Baumbach, Peter
Schönstrasse 20
81543 München / DE
05 / Brosig, Jochen
Hirtenweg 9
82031 Grünwald / DE
06 / Esser, Gregor
Brunnenstrasse 1
85540 Haar / DE
07 / Füss, Monika
Adlzreiterstrasse 9
80337 München / DE
08 / Guilino, Günther
Kriegelsteinerstrasse 3
81476 München / DE
09 / Haimerl, Walter
Thalkirchnerstrasse 78a
80337 München / DE
10 / Meixner, Christine
Volkartstrasse 30
80634 München / DE
11 / Pfeiffer, Herbert
Georg-Hahn-Strasse 16
81247 München / DE
12 / Rohrbach, Manfred
Dorfstrasse 22
85241 Hebertshausen / DE
Representative(s)Münich, Wilhelm
Dr. Münich & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Mayr-Strasse 11
80689 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Münich, Wilhelm, Dr.
Kanzlei Münich, Steinmann, Schiller Wilhelm-Mayr-Str. 11
80689 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118534.930.03.1995
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE1994441115730.03.1994         Original published format: DE 4411157
DE1994443850629.10.1994         Original published format: DE 4438506
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969309
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969309
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Serie progressiver Brillengläser[2000/01]
English:Set of progressive spectacle lenses[2000/01]
French:Série de lentilles de lunettes progressives[2000/01]
Examination procedure01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
11.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2002Fee for grant paid
18.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95913876.9  / EP0701709
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0039497  (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US3910691  (MAITENAZ BERNARD F) [A] 1 * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 29; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9101508  (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 4 *;
 [A]WO8502689  (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 5 *