Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990603

EP0990603 - Device for supporting plate-shaped pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cimatec GmbH
Woogmorgen
67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Czicholl, Uwe
Kupferbergerstrasse 59
67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE
02 / Hoder, Hilmar, Prof. Dr.-Ing.
Westerfelde 5
22397 Hamburg / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Klickow, Hans-Henning
Klickow & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Jessenstrasse 4
DE-22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Klickow, Hans-Henning
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99118536.420.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814451528.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844515
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990603
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/32, B65G47/08
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Halterung von plattenförmigen Elementen[2000/14]
English:Device for supporting plate-shaped pieces[2000/14]
French:Dispositif pour supporter des pièces en forme de plaquette[2000/14]
Examination procedure27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
12.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/06]
28.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5755317  (HOLSTON THOMAS RAYMOND [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 6, line 36 - line 42; figures 1-4,7 *;
 [A]EP0748751  (VARA SRL [IT]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9218402  (LUCAS ALAN WILLIAM [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [D]EP0580669  (LUCAS ALAN WILLIAM [GB])
by applicantFR2594810
 EP0580669
 US4723652