Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989751

EP0989751 - Information distributing apparatus and information distributing method, information receiving apparatus and information receiving method as well as information receiving and distributing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sako, Yoichiro c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ito, Shuichi c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Inokuchi, Tatsuya c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Obata, Masayuki c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Sakurai, Kazuko c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2008/49]
Former [2000/13]01 / Sako, Yoichiro
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ito, Shuichi
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Inokuchi, Tatsuya
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Obata, Masayuki
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Sakurai, Kazuko
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118613.121.09.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateJP1998026848222.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26848298
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989751
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989751
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989751
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, G06Q90/00
[2008/26]
Former International [2001/50]H04N7/173, G06F17/60
Former International [2000/13]H04N7/173
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2003/01]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Informationsverteilungsgerät und Informationsverteilungsverfahren, Informationsempfangsgerät und Informationsempfangsverfahren und Verfahren zum Informationsempfang und zur Informationsverteilung[2000/13]
English:Information distributing apparatus and information distributing method, information receiving apparatus and information receiving method as well as information receiving and distributing method[2000/13]
French:Appareil et méthode de distribution d'informations, appareil et méthode de réception d'informations et méthode de réception et distribution d'informations[2000/13]
Examination procedure10.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
03.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2008Fee for grant paid
31.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0766475  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 5 - line 21 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 8 * * column 9, line 39 - line 53 * * column 12, line 25 - line 47 * * claims 1,3-5 * [Y] 3,5,10,12;
 [XY]WO9612256  (TECHNICAL MAINTENANCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 17,18 * figures 1-3 * * page 13, line 1 - line 2 * * page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 20 * * page 18, line 28 - line 35 * * page 19, line 5 - line 19 * * claims 1,2 * [Y] 3,5,10,12;
 [YA]EP0696121  (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 3,5,10,12 * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 55 * * claims 1,2,4,8,12,15 * [A] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13,14,17,18;
 [A]FR2760584  (DAURY PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-14,17,18 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 32 - line 35 * * page 3, line 24 - line 28 * * claims 1,2,4,6 *;
 [A]WO9729584  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-14,17,18 * figure 2 * * page 7, line 13 - line 16 * * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0715243  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-14,17,18 * figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 21 * * page 10, line 25 - page 15, line 18 * * page 17, line 28 - page 19, line 14 * * page 20, line 28 - page 25, line 25 *;
 [A]JPH02240710  ;
 [A]US4484217  (BLOCK ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 17,18 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 12 * * column 6, line 15 - line 20 * * column 7, line 20 - line 28 * * column 8, line 49 - line 55 * * column 13, line 62 - line 68 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901213), vol. 014, no. 561, Database accession no. (P - 1142), [A] 3-5,10-12 * abstract *