Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994072

EP0994072 - Ammonia synthesis process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]Isothermal ammonia converter
[2001/34]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc.
601 Jefferson Avenue Houston
Texas 77002-7990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc.
601 Jefferson Avenue
Houston, Texas 77002-7990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Czuppon, Thomas A.
5835 Sugar Hill
Houston, Texas 77057 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. , et al
Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118638.821.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998016987412.10.1998         Original published format: US 169874
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994072
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994072
Date:17.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C01C1/04
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ammoniak[2001/34]
English:Ammonia synthesis process[2001/34]
French:Procédé pour synthèse d'ammoniac[2001/34]
Former [2000/16]Isothermischer Ammoniakreaktor
Former [2000/16]Isothermal ammonia converter
Former [2000/16]Convertisseur isothermique d'ammoniac
Examination procedure04.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
27.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2002Fee for grant paid
17.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
FI17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
DK17.07.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
LU21.09.2002
IE23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
DK17.07.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
LU21.09.2002
IE23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
Former [2004/10]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
DK17.07.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
IE23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
Former [2003/46]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
DK17.07.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
IE23.09.2002
Former [2003/42]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
IE23.09.2002
Former [2003/21]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
PT17.07.2002
SE17.07.2002
Former [2003/19]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
GR17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
SE17.07.2002
Former [2003/16]AT17.04.2002
CH17.04.2002
LI17.04.2002
SE17.07.2002
Former [2003/10]AT17.04.2002
SE17.07.2002
Former [2002/42]SE17.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2046618  (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 8-17;
 [X]DE2929300  (LINDE AG) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2109361  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4568531  (VAN DIJK CHRISTIAAN P [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1938598  (LOUD HENRY S) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4822586  (SHANNAHAN CORNELIUS E [US]) [A] 1-17 * column W *;
 [A]US5000926  (MURAYAMA KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al)
 [A]  - NIELSEN A. (ED.), Ammonia catalysis and manufacture, BERLIN (DE), SPRINGER, XP002128277 [A] 1-11 * page 232 - page 237 *