Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995866

EP0995866 - Lock, in particular espagnolette lock [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Fliether GmbH & Co. KG
Nevigeser Strasse 22
42551 Velbert / DE
[2004/46]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
KARL FLIETHER GmbH & Co.
Nevigeser Strasse 22
D-42551 Velbert / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Axmann, Horst
Borkhorsterweg 4a
42549 Velbert / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Grundmann, Dirk , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Grundmann, Dirk, Dr. , et al
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99118672.722.09.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814886423.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848864
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995866
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995866
Date:26.11.2003
[2003/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995866
Date:26.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:E05B63/20, E05C9/18
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Schloss, insbesondere Treibstangenschloss[2000/17]
English:Lock, in particular espagnolette lock[2000/17]
French:Serrure, notamment crémone serrure[2000/17]
Examination procedure08.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
10.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2004Fee for grant paid
07.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.01.2005
DK26.04.2005
GR26.04.2005
SE26.04.2005
PT26.06.2005
CY22.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]FI26.01.2005
DK26.04.2005
GR26.04.2005
SE26.04.2005
CY22.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]FI26.01.2005
DK26.04.2005
GR26.04.2005
SE26.04.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/14]FI26.01.2005
DK26.04.2005
GR26.04.2005
SE26.04.2005
Former [2006/12]FI26.01.2005
DK26.04.2005
SE26.04.2005
Former [2005/48]FI26.01.2005
SE26.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI26.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0798436  (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 8, line 17 - column 15, line 34; figures 1-19 *;
 [A]DE3505379  (FLIETHER KARL GMBH & CO) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 53; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US5820177  (MOON CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-6 *;
 [AD]EP0431369  (BKS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0431369
 DE29605517U
 DE3836694