Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990982

EP0990982 - Random-Number generation using a plurality of clock signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2002  [2002/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hamasako, Shuki, NEC IC Microcomputer Systems, Ltd
403-53, Kosugimachi 1-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118707.122.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998027365828.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27365898
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990982
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/58
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zufallszahlenerzeugung unter Verwendung von mehreren Taktsignalen[2000/14]
English:Random-Number generation using a plurality of clock signals[2000/14]
French:Génération de nombre aleatoire utilisant une pluralité de signaux d'horloge[2000/14]
Examination procedure05.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
10.10.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9743709  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR2390047  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 8, line 4 - line 16; figures 1,5 *;
 [X]US4665502  (KREISNER WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 10 - line 37 *;
 [A]  LONG, "VCOs generate selectable pseudo-random noise", ELECTRONICS, USA, (19780928), vol. 51, no. 20, page 127, 129, XP002123118 [A] 1-10