Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974627

EP0974627 - Ink-jet recording method, and ink-jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.05.2013  [2013/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tochihara, Shinichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugimoto, Hitoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Sato, Shinichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Gotoh, Fumihiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Uetuki, Masaya
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2003/41]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Oser, Andreas
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118733.708.07.1993
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1992018399210.07.1992         Original published format: JP 18399292
JP1992018399310.07.1992         Original published format: JP 18399392
JP1993008116417.03.1993         Original published format: JP 8116493
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974627
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00, B41J2/01
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungsverfahren und Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:Ink-jet recording method, and ink-jet recording apparatus[2000/04]
French:Procédé d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et dispositif d'enregistrement par jet d'encre[2000/04]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/18]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93110929.2  / EP0592774
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19930110929) is  05.12.1995
Request for further processing for:23.02.2006Request for further processing filed
23.02.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.03.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 11
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 12
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 13
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 14
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 15
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 16
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 17
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 18
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 19
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 20
Documents cited:Search[A]US5116409  (MOFFATT JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 48-64 *;
 [A]EP0483610  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * claims 1,15 *;
 [A]EP0404494  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, lines 25-30; example 1 *;
 [A]EP0272936  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, columns 19-27; example 12 *
by applicantEP0483610