Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991224

EP0991224 - Method, receiver and radio station for recognizing a user data block with erroneous data symbols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gossner, Jochen
Schillerstrasse 4
D-86259 Schrobenhausen / DE
[2000/14]
Application number, filing date99118736.022.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814470229.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844702
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991224
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991224
Date:06.03.2002
[2002/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/20
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/48]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Empfangseinrichtung und Funkstation zur Erkennung eines Nutzdatenblocks mit fehlerhaften Nutzdatensymbolen[2000/14]
English:Method, receiver and radio station for recognizing a user data block with erroneous data symbols[2000/14]
French:Méthode, récepteur et station radio pour reconnaître des blocs de données utiles avec des symboles de données erronés[2000/14]
Examination procedure22.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
30.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2003Fee for grant paid
21.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
10.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5557639  (HEIKKILA ILKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-11 * Zusammenfassung *; column 2 - column 4 *;
 [A]EP0805572  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * Zusammenfassung * * Spalte 1 *; column 5 *;
 [T]WO9853630  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [T] 4,9 * page 7, line 13 - line 20 *