blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969148 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969148



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 96
04.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
21.07.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.08.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.07.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
15.07.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 3
31.03.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
31.03.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
31.03.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
28.01.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2003 Description Search / examination 2
28.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.01.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
03.01.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
26.08.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.08.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.12.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
23.02.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
23.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 2
23.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
23.09.1999 Description Search / examination 9
23.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
23.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6