blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969148


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
11.02.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2005  [2005/13]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
10.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.10.2004  [2004/44]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
23.07.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.09.2004  [2004/37]
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
28.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2004  [2004/29]
13.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
30.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
02.08.2003 (Expected) grant published on  17.09.2003  [2003/38]
25.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.02.2003 Surcharge for renewal fee
07.02.2003 Renewal fee
05.02.2003 Examination report or reply
28.12.2002 Examination report or reply
03.12.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
23.08.2002 First examination report
21.08.2002 Examination report or reply
08.11.2001 Renewal fee
07.02.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
07.02.2001 Renewal fee
30.11.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
04.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
19.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
16.11.1999 Change - extension states
14.10.1999 Change - extension states
14.10.1999 Renewal fee