blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0969148 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP96116158 EP99118760



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0969148Global Dossier 17.09.2003B1
EP0969148 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
EP96116158 09.10.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29501767U 06.04.1995U1
Priority number Date
DE29501767 05.02.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29515884U 07.12.1995U1
Priority number Date
DE29501767 05.02.1995
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59607491D 20.09.2001D1
Priority number Date
DE59607491 09.10.1996
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59610722D 23.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE59610722 09.10.1996
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0768429T 31.10.2002T1
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
EP96116158 09.10.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0969148T 31.12.2003T1
Priority number Date
EP99118760 09.10.1996
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0768429Global Dossier 16.08.2001B1
EP0768429 16.04.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT204351T 15.09.2001T
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT250166T 15.10.2003T
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0768429T 10.12.2001T3
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0969148T 08.12.2003T3
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2162964T 16.01.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2209307T 16.06.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT768429E 28.02.2002E
Priority number Date
DE29515884 10.10.1995
TypeType Earlier application
 EP0768429