Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0969148

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 09.10.2003
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FILapse: 17.09.2003
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 17.12.2003
 IELapse: 17.09.2003
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 09.10.2003
 MCLapse: 31.10.2003
 NL 
 PTLapse: 26.12.2003
 SELapse: 10.10.2003
Examination procedure15.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
31.10.200207   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2003
European patent granted17.09.2003
Opposition procedure18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 08.09.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:768429
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 19991005
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991005
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 19991005
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020826
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030917
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030917
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0768429
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:SI
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:30.09.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:09.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031009
 
Event date:09.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031009
 
Event date:10.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031010
 
Event date:23.10.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59610722
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20031023
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.10.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:31.10.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20031031
 
Event date:08.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:09.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:17.12.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20031217
 
Event date:26.12.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20031226
 
Event date:07.01.2004 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20031211
 
Event date:21.04.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:15.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:16.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2209307 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:29.06.2004 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:09.07.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:15.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG
 
Event date:15.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 09.06.2004 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.
 
Event date:08.09.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040618
 
Event date:25.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20050425
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:25.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20050425
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:25.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20050425
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:26.04.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20050426
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:09.10.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051009
 
Event date:10.10.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051010
 
Event date:31.10.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051031
 
Event date:01.12.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20051201
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:26.04.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20060426
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060501
 
Event date:06.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060630
 
Event date:03.07.2006 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20060501
 
Event date:20.10.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20060630
 
Event date:31.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:31.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:16.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20051010
 
Event date:15.06.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
OWNER NAME:*MULLER HARALD
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:26.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59610722 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:MUELLER, MARC OLIVER, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: MUELLER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING., 45473 MUELHEIM, DE
Effective DATE:20110321
 
Event date:26.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59610722 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER NAME:MUELLER, JENS, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: MUELLER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING., 45473 MUELHEIM, DE
Effective DATE:20110321
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20141022
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20151021
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20151009
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151009
 
Event date:09.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59610722 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT