Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969148

EP0969148 - Railroad security fence [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Müller, Harald
Kappenstrasse 39
45473 Mülheim / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Pausch, Thomas Ernst
Traungasse 3
4810 Gmunden / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Pausch, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys.
Schirmgasse 294
84028 Landshut / DE
Application number, filing date99118760.009.10.1996
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateDE1995215884U10.10.1995         Original published format: DE 29515884 U
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969148
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969148
Date:17.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E01B26/00, E01F13/02, E04H17/14
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesSI05.10.1999
TitleGerman:Gleissicherungseinrichtung[2000/01]
English:Railroad security fence[2000/01]
French:Barrière de sécurité de chemin de fer[2000/01]
Examination procedure05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
26.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2003Fee for grant paid
15.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96116158.5  / EP0768429
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2001
31.10.200207   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
AT09.10.2003
LU09.10.2003
SE10.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
[2007/18]
Former [2005/13]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
AT09.10.2003
LU09.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
DE01.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
LU09.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
DE01.05.2004
Former [2004/44]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
LU09.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
DE01.05.2004
Former [2004/39]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
LU09.10.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/31]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI17.09.2003
IE17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI17.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]AU5942473  (WOOLCOCK R J) [Y] 1,4-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1572791  (DENECROWN LTD) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 78 - page 2, line 60; figures 2-7 *;
 [DY]DE29501767U  (LADEMANN BEWACHUNGSSCHUTZ [DE]) [DY] 1,4-8 * page 4, line 36 - page 6, line 26; figures 1-3 *