Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993019

EP0993019 - Method for reducing aliasing effects in scanning beam microscopy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
2881 Scott Blvd
M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95050 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
APPLIED MATERIALS, INC.
2881 Scott Blvd, M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dotan, Noam
9 Hamaayan Street
Givataim / IL
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 33 09 20
80069 München / DE
Application number, filing date99118816.023.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1998015882623.09.1998         Original published format: US 158826
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993019
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993019
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993019
Date:25.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/22, H01J37/28
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/50]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reduzierung von Artefakterscheinungen in der Raster-Elektronenmikroskopie[2000/15]
English:Method for reducing aliasing effects in scanning beam microscopy[2000/15]
French:Procédé de réduction des effets d'artefact en microscopie électronique à balayage[2000/15]
Examination procedure31.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2005Fee for grant paid
23.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.05.2005
NL25.05.2005
GB23.09.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]NL25.05.2005
GB23.09.2005
Former [2006/22]NL25.05.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0748108  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 10,13,14 * abstract * [A] 1,11;
 [XA]US3767926  (COATES V, et al) [X] 13,14 * column 1, lines 43-47 * * column 3, lines 40-60 * * column 4, lines 37-52 * [A] 1;
 [A]US4363037  (TAUDT HEINZ) [A] 1,10,11 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 62 *
 [AD]  OHO E ET AL, "NEW GENERATION SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPY TECHNOLOGY BASED ON THE CONCEPT OF ACTIVE IMAGE PROCESSING", SCANNING,US,MAHWAH, NJ, (1997), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 483 - 488, XP000852689 [AD] 1,10,11,13,16 * the whole document *