Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969183

EP0969183 - Plug [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600
Houston Texas 77027 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb Inc.
CSC - The United States Corporation Company, 1013 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Budde, Peter
c/o Marsel Budde, Waterleidingenstaat 1
3134 KC, Vlaardingen / NL
02 / Giroux, Richard Lee
1642 Peeble Chase Drive
Katy, TX 77450 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hagmann-Smith, Martin P.
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]Hagmann-Smith, Martin Peter
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2000/01]Lind, Robert , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date99118826.926.04.1996
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1995042976326.04.1995         Original published format: US 429763
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969183
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969183
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969183
Date:21.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/16, E21B33/05, E21B34/06
[2000/41]
Former International [2000/01]E21B33/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Stopfen[2000/01]
English:Plug[2000/01]
French:Bouchon[2000/01]
Examination procedure22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2003Fee for grant paid
10.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96914271.0  / EP0820556
Opposition(s)22.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.01.2004
IT21.01.2004
NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FR21.01.2004
NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
Former [2006/12]NL21.01.2004
DE22.04.2004
Former [2005/12]DE22.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[PA]EP0697496  (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [PA] 1 * column 8, line 1 - line 6 * * column 8, line 28 - line 37; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5323858  (JONES RICHARD R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - line 65 *