Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069352

EP1069352 - Throttle valve support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Welteroth, Peter
Siegstrasse 123
53783 Eitorf / DE
02 / Sauerschell, Wolfgang
Mauerfeldstrasse 18
61440 Oberursel / DE
03 / Bornmann, Gerd
Frankfurter Strasse 37
65239 Hochheim / DE
04 / Bachnak, Nouhad
Frankenallee 103
60326 Frankfurt / DE
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2001/03]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99118842.624.09.1999
[2001/03]
Priority number, dateDE199913288116.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19932881
DE199913287816.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19932878
[2001/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1069352
Date:17.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1069352
Date:14.08.2002
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069352
Date:21.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16K1/22, F02D9/10
[2002/33]
Former International [2001/03]F16K1/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/20]
Former [2001/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drosselklappenstutzen[2001/03]
English:Throttle valve support[2001/03]
French:Support de vanne d'étranglement[2001/03]
Examination procedure05.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
20.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2003Fee for grant paid
17.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3924611  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 4 - line 33; figure . *;
 [A]JPH10227233  ;
 [A]JPH04183940  ;
 [A]DE4017671  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921015), vol. 016, no. 498, Database accession no. (M - 1325), [A] 1 * abstract *