Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994565

EP0994565 - Temperature sensing in voltage drive type semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8010 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI HARAMACHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
10-2, Benten-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi
Ibaraki 317-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8010 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI HARAMACHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
10-2, Benten-cho-3-chome Hitachi-shi
Ibaraki 317-0072 / JP
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI HARAMACHI ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
10-2, Benten-cho-3-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 317-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hasegawa, Hiroyuki
6-8, Ose-cho 4-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 317-0076 / JP
02 / Kurosu, Toshiki
16-5, Suwa-cho 4-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316-0001 / JP
03 / Sugayama, Shigeru
18-7, Omika-cho 4-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1221 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2000/16]
Application number, filing date99118891.324.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998028906012.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28906098
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994565
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994565
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994565
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/082
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [2004/24]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Temperaturerfassung in einem spannungsgesteuerten Halbleiter-Bauelement[2000/16]
English:Temperature sensing in voltage drive type semiconductor device[2000/16]
French:Détermination de la température dans un dispositif semi-conducteur du type à commande par la tension[2000/16]
Examination procedure11.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
27.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2006Fee for grant paid
22.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0702455  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7 * page 4, column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 48; figures 1,2 * [A] 6;
 [XA]JPH0832361  ;
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [X] 1,3,7 * abstract * [A] 6
 [A]  - ECKEL H-G ET AL., "Optimization of the turn-off performance of IGBT at overcurrent and short circuit current", POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS, Brighton, (19930913), vol. 2, pages 317 - 322, XP002237513 [A] 2,6 * the whole document *