blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990833


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.09.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
17.09.2004 (Expected) grant published on  03.11.2004  [2004/45]
10.09.2004 Change - representative published on  27.10.2004  [2004/44]
01.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2002 Renewal fee
31.08.2001 Renewal fee
27.12.2000 Change - extension states
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
13.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  29.11.2000 [2000/48]
11.10.2000 Change - extension states
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]