blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990833
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0990833T 30.04.2005T1
Priority number Date
EP99118918 25.09.1999
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0990833Global Dossier 03.11.2004B1
EP0990833 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT281626T 15.11.2004T
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69921577T 03.11.2005T2
DE69921577D 09.12.2004D1
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0990833T 21.02.2005T3
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2230781T 01.05.2005T3
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IT1302104 20.07.2000B1
ITVI980189 03.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT990833E 31.03.2005E
Priority number Date
ITVI980189 02.10.1998