Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990833

EP0990833 - Wall mounting for television camera housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Videotec s.r.l.
Via Lago Maggiore, 15
36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Grotto, Alessio
Via Cardinale E. Dalla Costa, 9
36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro , et al
Studio Tecnico
Ing. Pietro Bettello
Via Col d'Echele 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/44]Bettello, Pietro , et al
Studio Tecnico Ing. Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Former [2000/14]Bettello, Pietro, Dott. Ing. , et al
Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date99118918.425.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateIT1998VI0018902.10.1998         Original published format: IT VI980189
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990833
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990833
Date:03.11.2004
Language:FR
[2004/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16M11/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesLT27.09.2000
LV27.09.2000
RO27.09.2000
SI27.09.2000
TitleGerman:Wandbefestigung für Fernsehkameragehäuse[2000/14]
English:Wall mounting for television camera housing[2000/14]
French:Support mural pour boîtier de caméra de télévision[2000/14]
Examination procedure27.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
01.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2004Fee for grant paid
21.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.11.2004
[2005/24]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5790910  (HASKIN IGOR [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 65 *;
 [A]FR2614438  (LEPERS PHILIPPE [FR])