Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992211

EP0992211 - Vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH
Mühlenweg 17-37
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Hilgers, Stefan
Postreitweg 138
45145 Essen / DE
02 / Rodemann, Thomas
Auf dem Pfade 11
44879 Bochum / DE
03 / Jacobs, Carsten
Krebsöge 3
45477 Radevormwald / DE
04 / Iglseder, Heinrich
Roswitha-von-Gandersheimweg 32
42897 Remscheid / DE
05 / Meyer, Frank
Parkstrasse 61
58675 Hemer / DE
06 / Zeeb, Gerhard
Oberwall 51
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Müller, Enno , et al
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45
42329 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99118919.225.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814610307.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846103
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992211
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992211
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/04, A47L9/28, A47L9/00, A47L13/40
[2000/34]
Former International [2000/15]A47L9/04, A47L13/40
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesLT29.01.2001
LV29.01.2001
SI29.01.2001
TitleGerman:Staubsauger[2000/15]
English:Vacuum cleaner[2000/15]
French:Aspirateur[2000/15]
Examination procedure29.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
12.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
07.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[PX]JPH10295594  ;
 JPH10295594  [ ];
 [X]JPH02268715  ;
 [X]DE3143489  (VOLKRODT WOLFGANG) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * page 4, column 4 - page 5, column 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH10248769  ;
 [A]US4197610  (SCHNEIDER HORST W [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 30 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [A]DE3820931  (KIST PETER [DE]) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9623440  (INCREA OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 14 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]DE19644589  (WESSEL WERK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * * figure - *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10295594 A 19981110 (KUWATAKE H) [PX] 1,2,4-6,10 * abstract * * figures 1-4,13 *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 04, Database accession no. 1999-038474, XP002141576 & JPH10295594 A 19981110 (KUWATAKE H) [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910124), vol. 015, no. 031, Database accession no. (C - 0798), & JP02268715 A 19901102 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10248769 A 19980922 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,5-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *