Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990463

EP0990463 - Reactive plate for removal of gaseous impurities and a method of its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.06.2003  [2003/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGS Jicin a.s.
Jungmannvoa 11
50648 Jicin / CZ
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Matzke, Vladimir
Revolucni 275
50601 Jicin / CZ
02 / Fischer, Petr
Stara osada 45
46605 Jablonec n.N. / CZ
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Bergmeier, Werner
Canzler & Bergmeier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date99118929.125.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateCZ1998000312229.09.1998         Original published format: CZ 312298
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990463
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990463
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/82, B01D53/74, C08K5/21
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reaktive Platte für zur Entfernung von gasförmigen Verunreinigungen und Verfahren zur deren Herstellung[2000/14]
English:Reactive plate for removal of gaseous impurities and a method of its production[2000/14]
French:Plaque réactive pour l'élimination d'impurétés gazeuses et procédé pour sa production[2000/14]
Examination procedure06.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/25]
16.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]CZ279833  (KABOUREK PAVEL [CZ]) [AD] 1-7 * figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH03262532  ;
 [A]WO8706923  (PERRY ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 16 - page 10, line 9 *;
 [A]WO8702023  (FUEL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 066, Database accession no. (C - 0912), [A] 1 * abstract *