Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997248

EP0997248 - Method and means for transfer of granular materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Camorani, Carlo Antonio
Via Radici in Monte, 175
42014 Roteglia di Castellarano (Reggio Emilia) / IT
For all designated states
Algeri, Maris
Via Radici in Monte, 175
I-42010 Roteglia di Castellarano (Reggio Emilia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Camorani, Carlo Antonio
Via Radici in Monte, 175
42014 Roteglia di Castellarano (Reggio Emilia) / IT
For all designated states
Algeri, Maris
Via Radici in Monte, 175
I-42010 Roteglia di Castellarano (Reggio Emilia) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Luppi, Luigi
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41100 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Luppi, Luigi
Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date99118949.927.09.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateIT1998MO0019628.09.1998         Original published format: IT MO980196
IT1998MO0019728.09.1998         Original published format: IT MO980197
IT1998MO0026122.12.1998         Original published format: IT MO980261
IT1998MO0026222.12.1998         Original published format: IT MO980262
EP1998012458323.12.1998         Original published format: EP 98124583
[2001/05]
Former [2000/21]IT1998MO0019628.09.1998
IT1998MO0019728.09.1998
IT1998MO0026122.12.1998
IT1998MO0026222.12.1998
Former [2000/18]IT1998MO0019628.09.1998
IT1998MO0019728.09.1998
IT1998MO0026122.12.1998
IT1998MO0026222.12.1998
EP1998012458323.12.1998
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997248
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997248
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: A3 RE ???tdavalues.publicationType.A3 RE??? 
No.:EP0997248
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997248
Date:07.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B28B5/00, B28B13/02
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von körnigem Material[2000/18]
English:Method and means for transfer of granular materials[2000/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour transférer un matériau granuleux[2000/18]
Examination procedure06.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
18.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2004Fee for grant paid
04.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
CY07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
IE27.09.2004
LU27.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
DK07.10.2004
GB07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
[2007/18]
Former [2006/13]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
NL07.07.2004
IE27.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
DK07.10.2004
GB07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/46]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
IE27.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/28]AT07.07.2004
BE07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
MC30.09.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
MC30.09.2004
DK07.10.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT07.07.2004
CH07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
LI07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
GR07.10.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT07.07.2004
FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI07.07.2004
SE07.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE07.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0927687  (ALGERI MARIS [IT], et al) [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * * column 8, line 46 - column 14, line 49 * * claims 15-35 * * figures 12-32 *;
 [XA]EP0858873  (GRUPPO CONCORDE S P A [IT]) [X] 1,11,15 * the whole document * * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 57 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 2,3,5,7,9,10,12-14,16;
 [A]US5019200  (KAWABATA SHOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7,10-12,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4306595  (LONGINOTTI ALFREDO) [A] 1,10,11,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0860256  (SACMI [IT]) [A] 1,10,11,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9823424  (CAMORANI CARLO ANTONIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7,9,11-14,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0569070  (MASS SPA [IT]) [A] 1,10,11,15 * the whole document *