Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020321

EP1020321 - Removable armrest for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoffmann, Matthias
Am Thalbach 128 a
99439 Vippachedelhausen / DE
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Hoffmann Matthias
Am Thalbach 128 a
99439 Vippachedelhausen / DE
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Liedtke, Klaus
Liedtke & Partner
Patentanwälte
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10-11
99096 Erfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Liedtke, Klaus
Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 10
99096 Erfurt / DE
Former [2000/29]Liedtke, Klaus, Dr.
Postfach 10 09 56
99019 Erfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99118952.327.09.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199814434028.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844340
DE1998223670U28.09.1998         Original published format: DE 29823670 U
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020321
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020321
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/46
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Abnehmbare Armlehne für Kraftfahrzeuge[2000/29]
English:Removable armrest for vehicle[2000/29]
French:Accoudoir amovible pour véhicule[2000/29]
Examination procedure25.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/42]
12.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4592584  (WHITE JR PIERCE H) [X] 1-4 * column A; figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *;
 [X]FR2662402  (CONFORAUTO SARL [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [XA]GB795151  (VALERIE TAMPLIN) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8;
 [XDA]DE9111360U  (HERDA, GEORG) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8;
 [XD]DE29711897U  (EISENMENGER KLAUS [DE]) [XD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5527084  (SCHERF ANSGAR P T [DE]) [A] 1-5,8 * column A; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4002242  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *