Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992467

EP0992467 - Production of porous mullite bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.02.2004  [2004/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brundage, Robert Kevin
Corning Incorporated, Patent Dep., SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
02 / Lynn, Merrill
Corning Incorporated, Patent Dep., SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
03 / Hickman, David Lee
Corning Incorporated, Patent Dep., SP TI 3-1
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Marchant, James Ian , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Marchant, James Ian , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99118962.227.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS19980102620P01.10.1998         Original published format: US 102620 P
US19980102621P01.10.1998         Original published format: US 102621 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992467
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992467
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992467
Date:12.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/185, C04B38/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/14]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von porösen Mullitkörpern[2000/15]
English:Production of porous mullite bodies[2000/15]
French:Fabrication de pièces poreuses en mullite[2000/15]
Examination procedure06.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
17.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2002Fee for grant paid
16.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0425833  (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 50 - page 2, line 16 * * page 2, line 44 - line 55 * * claims 1,9,10 *;
 [A]EP0130734  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3 * * page 4 * * page 8, line 11 - line 14 *;
 [A]WO9825685  (ENSTO CERAMICS AB OY [FI], et al) [A] 13-18 * page 10, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 14 - line 27 * * claims 1-3,8 *