Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992589

EP0992589 - Glucose sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
2-8, Dojimahama, 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8230 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/29]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOBO CO., LTD.
2-8, Dojimahama, 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP
Former [2004/21]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yugawa, Keiko
708-1-513, Gakuendaiwa-cho 6-chome
Nara-shi, Nara 631-0041 / JP
02 / Yoshioka, Toshihiko
15-15-307, Takatsuka-cho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP
03 / Nankai, Shiro
4-50-12, Nasuzukuri
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP
04 / Iwata, Junko
298-1, Oaza-Uemura-kou, Shigenobu-cho
Onsen-gun, Ehime 791-0221 / JP
05 / Miyazaki, Shoji
1052, Minamisaya-cho
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791-8032 / JP
06 / Baba, Hideyuki
340-2, Kitakume-cho
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 790-0923 / JP
07 / Takeshima, Seiji, c/o Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha
Tsuruga Inst. of Biotechn., 10-24, Toyo-cho
Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/15]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Clemensstrasse 30
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119014.128.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998027615329.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27615398
JP1999021270327.07.1999         Original published format: JP 21270399
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992589
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992589
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992589
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/00, G01N27/327
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/23]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Glukose-sensor[2000/15]
English:Glucose sensor[2000/15]
French:Capteur de glucose[2000/15]
Examination procedure20.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
31.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2004Fee for grant paid
04.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0357027  (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5378628  (GRAETZEL MICHAEL [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US5804047  (KARUBE ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *