EP1089328 - Method for manufacturing of a semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | For all designated states Semiconductor 300 GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 10 04 46 01074 Dresden / DE | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Semiconductor 300 GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 10 04 46 01074 Dresden / DE | |||
For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraxenberger, Manfred An den Eichen 4 01458 Ottendorf / DE | 02 /
Kneupel, Ines Zeunerstrasse 73 01069 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Spuler, Bruno Ewald Kluge Strasse 82 01478 Weixdorf / DE | 04 /
Schedel, Thorsten Kunitzteichweg 2 01109 Dresden / DE | 05 /
Mautz, Karl Josef Hermann Strasse 10A 01326 Dresden / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119038.0 | 29.09.1999 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089328 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/302 (EP,US);
Y10S438/928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterbauelementes | [2001/14] | English: | Method for manufacturing of a semiconductor device | [2001/14] | French: | Méthode de formation d'un dispositif semiconducteur | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/28] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0701276 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 5-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5599722 (SUGISAKA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, lines 50-64 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-4 *; | [DY]US5856230 (JANG SE AUG [KR]) [DY] 1-3,5-9 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 61; figure 1 *; | [A]US5893760 (MIKATA YUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 61; figure 8 * |