Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994257

EP0994257 - External gear pump with delivery limitation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schwäbische Hüttenwerke GmbH
Wilhelmstrasse 67
73433 Aalen-Wasseralfingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Schwäbische Hüttenwerke GmbH
Wilhelmstrasse 67
73433 Aalen-Wasseralfingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schreiber, Bernd
Gartenstrasse 43
88371 Ebersbach-Musbach / DE
02 / Stützle, Günther
Buchauerstrasse 46
88427 Bad Schussenried / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Strasse 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119067.930.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814713213.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847132
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994257
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994257
Date:06.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04C15/04, F04C2/18
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Aussenzahnradpumpe mit Fördervolumenbegrenzung[2000/16]
English:External gear pump with delivery limitation[2000/16]
French:Pompe à engrenages externes avec limitation du débit[2000/16]
Examination procedure08.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
08.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
17.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
23.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2001Fee for grant paid
17.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
IE06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
AT30.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
LU30.09.2002
[2004/43]
Former [2004/39]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
AT30.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
LU30.09.2002
Former [2004/10]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
AT30.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
Former [2004/03]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
AT30.09.2002
BE30.09.2002
Former [2003/51]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
BE30.09.2002
Former [2003/46]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
DK06.05.2002
PT06.05.2002
Former [2003/19]FI06.02.2002
GR06.02.2002
PT06.05.2002
Former [2003/06]FI06.02.2002
PT06.05.2002
Former [2002/49]FI06.02.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3528651  (ROHS HANS GUENTHER PROF DR ING [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * column 3, line 11 - line 53; figures 1-4,9 *;
 [Y]GB781697  (BORG WARNER) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 4, line 29 - line 102; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2354992  (MANIOUS GOTTLIEB) [A] 1-4,7,8 * page 1, column R, line 28 - page 2, column L, line 61; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2149326  (WILKIN GEORGE W) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 33 - page 2, column R, line 4; figures 1-5 *
ExaminationJPS5773880
 JPS462624B