Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993147

EP0993147 - Radio server system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION
1-5-1, Ohtemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Materials Corporation
1-5-1, Ohtemachi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tari, Kazuyoshi
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297 Kitabukuro-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330-0835 / JP
02 / Unoki, Hiroyuki
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297 Kitabukuro-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330-0835 / JP
03 / Murayama, Kenichi
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297 Kitabukuro-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330-0835 / JP
04 / Nakamura, Kenzo
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297 Kitabukuro-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330-0835 / JP
05 / Yokoshima, Takao
Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1-297 Kitabukuro-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama 330-0835 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119075.230.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998029459230.09.1998         Original published format: JP 29459298
JP1998033632126.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33632198
JP1999013931119.05.1999         Original published format: JP 13931199
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993147
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993147
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L29/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/41]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Radioserver System[2000/15]
English:Radio server system[2000/15]
French:Système de serveur par radio[2000/15]
Examination procedure15.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/16]
17.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.08.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001
30.09.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0419244  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-11,20-26 * page 3, line 21 - page 3, line 44 * * figure 11 * [Y] 12-15,27,28;
 [XY]EP0589280  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-11,20-26 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 46 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 8 * [Y] 12-15,27,28;
 [XY]EP0522885  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,20-26 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 12 * * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 13 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 4 * [Y] 12-15,27,28;
 [X]GB2260468  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 16-19,29,30 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 28 - page 10, line 15 *;
 [X]WO9406220  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 16-19,29,30 * page 9, line 25 - page 14, line 21 * * page 18, line 11 - page 19, line 28 *;
 [X]US5355522  (DEMANGE MARK G [US]) [X] 16-19,29,30 * column 1, line 49 - column 6, line 14 * * figures 1,2,6-8 *;
 [Y]US5708655  (TOTH STEFAN [SE], et al) [Y] 12-15,27,28 * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 32 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 54 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO9838817  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [Y] 12-15,27,28 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 19 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]US5715516  (HOWARD DAVID AMUNDSON [US], et al) [A] 1-15,20-28 * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 27 * * column 9, line 50 - column 20, line 58 * * column 12, line 62 - column 15, line 20 * * column 21, line 46 - column 24, line 22 * * column 17, line 65 - column 19, line 34 *;
 [A]US5410737  (JONES J BARCLAY [US]) [A] 16-19,29,30 * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 31 * * column 6, line 65 - column 10, line 64 *;
 [A]EP0854657  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 16-19,29,30 * the whole document *
 [A]  AKERBERG D ET AL, "On channel definitions and rules for continuous dynamic channel selection in coexistence etiquettes for radio systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1994 IEEE 44TH STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN 8-10 JUNE 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940608), ISBN 0-7803-1927-3, pages 809 - 813, XP002180311 [A] 1-15,20-28 * column 3, line 11 - column 3, line 31 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1994.345202