Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995783

EP0995783 - Use of an adhesive tape based on a non-woven substrate consolidated by a bonding agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]Adhesive tape based on a non-woven substrate consolidated by a bonding agent
[2005/07]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.07.2011
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2011Revocation of patentpublished on 10.08.2011  [2011/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
tesa SE
Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1
22848 Norderstedt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/20]For all designated states
tesa SE
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2004/37]For all designated states
tesa AG
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Tesa AG
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Külper, Klaus, Dr.
Fehrsstrasse 1A
25421 Pinneberg / DE
02 / Ganschow, Frank
Schützenstr. 7
25368 Kiebitzreihe / DE
 [2005/18]
Former [2000/17]01 / Külper, Klaus, Dr.
Fehrsstrasse 1A
25421 Pinneberg / DE
02 / Ganschow, Frank
Saarlandhof 40
25335 Elmshorn / DE
Application number, filing date99119112.304.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814905224.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19849052
DE199912140808.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19921408
DE199913744607.08.1999         Original published format: DE 19937446
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995783
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995783
Date:09.08.2000
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995783
Date:14.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/04, D04H1/48
[2000/33]
Former International [2000/17]C09J7/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Verwendung eines Klebebands auf Basis eines mittels Bindemittel verfestigten Vlieses[2005/07]
English:Use of an adhesive tape based on a non-woven substrate consolidated by a bonding agent[2005/07]
French:Utilisation d'un ruban adhésif à base d'un non-tissé renforcé par un liant[2005/07]
Former [2000/17]Klebeband auf Basis eines mittels Bindemittel verfestigten Vlieses
Former [2000/17]Adhesive tape based on a non-woven substrate consolidated by a bonding agent
Former [2000/17]Ruban adhésif à base d'un non-tissé renforcé par un liant
Examination procedure19.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
27.04.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2005Fee for grant paid
04.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.04.2006  04.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Scapa UK Ltd.
Manchester Road Ashton-under Lyne
Greater Manchester OL7 0ED / GB
Opponent's representative
Renken, Joachim
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/24]
Opponent(s)01  25.04.2006  04.05.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Scapa UK Ltd.
Manchester Road Ashton-under Lyne
Greater Manchester OL7 0ED / GB
Opponent's representative
Renken, Joachim
Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
20.10.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.07.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
14.04.2011Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/32]
Appeal following opposition27.01.2009Appeal received No.  T0258/09
26.03.2009Statement of grounds filed
14.04.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
14.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
20.04.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:14.03.2002Request for further processing filed
14.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.12.2005
FI14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
AT04.10.2006
LU04.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
AT04.10.2006
LU04.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2008/17]FI14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
AT04.10.2006
CH31.10.2006
LI31.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
Former [2007/02]FI14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
DK14.03.2006
GR14.03.2006
Former [2006/49]FI14.12.2005
IE14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
Former [2006/45]FI14.12.2005
NL14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
Former [2006/38]FI14.12.2005
GR14.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI14.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US5631073  (RIEDEL JOHN E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * column 5, line 34 - line 59 * * column 6, line 42 - line 56 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 55 * * column 9, line 14 - line 33 * * column 10, line 46 - line 53 * * examples 1-8 *;
 [X]EP0452594  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 2, line 7 - line 21 * * page 2, line 41 - line 56 * * page 6, line 44 - line 58 *;
 [A]EP0829222  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * claims 1-10 *;
 [DA]DE29804431U  (CERTOPLAST VORWERK & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * claim - * * example - * * page 7, line 12 - line 21 *