Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992254

EP0992254 - Dialysis system and cleaning and priming method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPRO CORPORATION
9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]For all designated states
NIPRO CORPORATION
9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Nipro Corporation
9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
NISSHO CORPORATION
9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 531 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nikaido, Taku
9-3 Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Ueda, Mistutaka
9-3 Honjo-nishi 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119161.006.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028571207.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28571298
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992254
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992254
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992254
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/16, A61M1/36
[2000/41]
Former International [2000/15]A61M1/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/26]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dialysevorrichtung und Verfahren zum Reinigen und Befüllen derselben[2000/15]
English:Dialysis system and cleaning and priming method thereof[2000/15]
French:Dispositif de dialyse et procédé de nettoyage et d'amorçage de celui-ci[2000/15]
Examination procedure18.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2005Fee for grant paid
19.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XDA]JPH0880346  ;
 [A]EP0826383  (MEDICAL SUPPORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 9 - line 16 * * column 5, line 33 - line 49 * * column 6, line 23 - line 28 * * column 7, line 18 - line 24 * * figures 2-4 *
 [XDA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, [XD] 3,4,6,8 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 1
ExaminationUS4935125
by applicantJPH0880346
 JPH08150201
 JPS5682B
 US4676905
 US4935125