Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994252

EP0994252 - Compressor for the production of oil free air [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Unger, Hans
St. Benediktstrasse 5
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Unger, Hans
St. Benediktstrasse 5
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
 [2002/29]
Former [2000/16]01 / see applicant
...
Application number, filing date99119190.907.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDE199814715913.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19847159
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994252
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994252
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994252
Date:13.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04B27/10, F04B39/06
[2000/45]
Former International [2000/16]F04B27/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/30]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kompressor zur Erzeugung ölfreier Druckluft[2000/16]
English:Compressor for the production of oil free air[2000/16]
French:Compresseur pour la production d'air sans lubrifiant[2000/16]
Examination procedure19.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
09.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
15.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2006Fee for grant paid
19.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19706066  (UNGER HANS DIPL ING [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3557664  (AKAIKE SEIJI, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 32; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US3458114  (CATTERSON ROBERT K) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 9; figure 2 *