Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976587

EP0976587 - Pneumatic radial tires [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Yoichi
1-9-6-201, Shintomi-Cho
Kawagoe City, Saitama Pref. / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99119194.122.01.1997
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1996000806722.01.1996         Original published format: JP 806796
JP1997000124608.01.1997         Original published format: JP 124697
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976587
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976587
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976587
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/18, B60C9/20
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Radiale Luftreifen[2000/05]
English:Pneumatic radial tires[2000/05]
French:Bandages pneumatiques radiaux[2000/05]
Examination procedure05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
04.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2003Fee for grant paid
03.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97300401.3  / EP0785095
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1067856  (PNEUMATIQUES CAOUTCHOUC MFG) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2671516  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 2; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPS5975807  ;
 [A]FR2661870  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]US4062393  (BERTRAND MARCEL J) [A] 1-3 * column W *;
 [A]LU66168  (INDUSTRIE PIRELLI) [A] 1-3 * page 9, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 5,6; claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840822), vol. 8, no. 182, Database accession no. (M - 319)<1619> , [A] 1 * abstract *