blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991236 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991236



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 85
21.07.2010 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
13.04.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.01.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.11.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.07.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
15.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
18.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
20.07.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
20.07.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.07.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
27.09.1999 Description Search / examination 11
27.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 5
27.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
27.09.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 23