blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991236


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.11.2009 Change - representative published on  30.12.2009  [2009/53]
14.04.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  31.05.2006  [2006/22]
28.12.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
01.11.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.07.2005 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2005 Deletion: Reply to examination report
17.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.06.2004 First examination report
04.06.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2002 Renewal fee
07.10.2002 Loss of particular rights
06.08.2002 Change - extension states
21.06.2002 Loss of particular rights
08.04.2002 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
05.04.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  22.05.2002  [2002/21]
15.10.2001 Renewal fee
10.08.2001 Request for examination filed published on  26.09.2001 [2001/39]
20.07.2001 Publication of search report published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
20.07.2001 Change - classification published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]