blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0991236

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
Examination procedure04.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200507   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 04L 27/227 A, 7H 04L 27/00 B
 
Event date:26.09.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010725
 
Event date:22.05.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:28.07.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040609
 
Event date:31.05.2006 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20051123