Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991236

EP0991236 - System and method for estimating the center frequency of a received signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwasaki, Motoya
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Pätzold, Herbert
Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen
Pasinger Strasse 6
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Pätzold, Herbert
Pätzold, Tandler, Riegger & Kollegen Steubstrasse 10
82116 Gräfelfing / DE
Former [2000/14]Pätzold, Herbert, Dr.-Ing.
Dr. Pätzold, Buhl-Müller, Tandler & Kollegen Steubstrasse 10
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date99119203.027.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998027355628.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27355698
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991236
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991236
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L27/227, H04L27/00
[2001/36]
Former International [2000/14]H04L27/227
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/21]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Schätzung der Zentralfrequenz eines Empfangssignals[2000/14]
English:System and method for estimating the center frequency of a received signal[2000/14]
French:Dispositif et méthode d'évaluation de la fréquence centrale d'un signal reçu[2000/14]
Examination procedure25.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
06.03.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.06.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/22]
04.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5598441  (KROEGER BRIAN W [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 45 * * column 3, line 25 - line 50 * * column 5, line 55 - line 65 * * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 60 * * figure 8 * [A] 2,11 [Y] 4-6,8-10;
 [Y]EP0593015  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,5,8,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - line 45 *;
 [Y]EP0788225  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 6,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 35 *;
 [A]EP0805573  (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 15 * * figure 3 *