Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992932

EP0992932 - Optoelectronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.02.2009  [2009/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leuze electronic GmbH + Co. KG
In der Braike
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
[2008/06]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Leuze electronic GmbH + Co.
In der Braike 1
D-73277 Owen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wörner, Jörg
Lerchenweg 4
73235 Weilheim/Teck / DE
02 / Nunnink, Laurens
Het Ruim 15
3823 SG Amersfoort / NL
03 / Schonenberg, Cornelis Reinier Johannes
Prins Clauslaan 13
3818 ZC Amersfoort / NL
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Patentanwalt
Jurastrasse 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Fabrikstrasse 18
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Application number, filing date99119219.627.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814616207.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846162
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992932
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992932
Date:29.05.2002
[2002/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992932
Date:12.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2003/08]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optoelektronische Vorrichtung[2000/15]
English:Optoelectronic device[2000/15]
French:Dispositif optoélectronique[2000/15]
Examination procedure16.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
27.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2008Fee for grant paid
23.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]US5576530  (HAGERTY JOSEPH J [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 48 - column 7, line 25 * * figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US5367152  (KRICHEVER MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 36 - line 64 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5663551  (HONE L MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 9 * * figures 3,5 *