Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001151

EP1001151 - Method and device for controlled stopping of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2005  [2005/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Fröschl, Joachim
Andechsstrasse 18
82211 Herrsching / DE
02 / Schlachetzki, Ulrich
Oberonstrasse 16
81927 München / DE
[2000/20]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/21]
Former [2000/20]Zollner, Richard , et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119247.728.09.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815222812.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19852228
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001151
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001151
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001151
Date:24.11.2004
Language:DE
[2004/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02D29/00, F02D17/00
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/01]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum kontrollierten Abstellen eines Verbrennungsmotors[2000/20]
English:Method and device for controlled stopping of an internal combustion engine[2000/20]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour arreter de facon controlé un moteur à combustion interne[2000/20]
Examination procedure27.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
20.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2004Fee for grant paid
22.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0913564  (SWATCH GROUP MAN SERV AG [CH]) [PX] 1,3 * figure 1 * * abstract * * claims 1-20 *;
 [A]DE4338740  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5813630  (WILLIAMS KENNETH R [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * figure 1 * * column A *;
 [A]DE19705340  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * abstract *