Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993100

EP0993100 - Assembling method for an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ganser, Otmar
Dieselstrasse 5 b
61476 Kronberg / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2000/15]Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99119314.529.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814568305.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19845683
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993100
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993100
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02K15/16
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/02]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Montage eines Elektromotors[2000/15]
English:Assembling method for an electric motor[2000/15]
French:Méthode d'assemblage d'un moteur élèctrique[2000/15]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/38]
23.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/39]
12.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2005925  (CESET SPA) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * page 1, line 127 - page 2, line 17; figures 1-3 * [A] 10-12;
 [X]US4128935  (CZECH JAMES I, et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,11,14 * column A * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 4; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]DE3318921  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,11,14 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2131629  (EUROP ELEC MOTORS DESIGN) [A] 1,3-7 * page 3, lines 32-64; figures 1,2 *