blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992939 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992939



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 83
10.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
05.09.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 1
21.05.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
27.12.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.12.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.12.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.12.2006 Request for change of name Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
20.09.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.06.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
08.11.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
29.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
29.09.1999 Description Search / examination 16
29.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
29.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6