blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992939


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.11.2009 Change - applicant published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
14.09.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
12.05.2007 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.12.2006 First examination report
21.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.12.2006 Change - applicant published on  17.01.2007  [2007/03]
31.10.2006 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2003 Change - applicant published on  19.11.2003  [2003/47]
09.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2002 Renewal fee
10.10.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]