Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992939

EP0992939 - Method for fabricating a microtransponder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Plettner, Andreas
Lennéstrasse 5
82340 Feldafing / DE
02 / Haberger, Karl
Adolf-Butenandt-Strasse 2
82152 Planegg / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119373.129.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814623707.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846237
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992939
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Mikrotransponders[2000/15]
English:Method for fabricating a microtransponder[2000/15]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'un microtransponder[2000/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
27.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
21.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0723244  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 41; figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0704816  (HUGHES IDENTIFICATION DEVICES [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *