Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
27.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
19.06.2002 | Change - extension states | |
04.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
22.02.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
01.11.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
01.06.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
18.02.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |