Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990824

EP0990824 - A tap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CAROMA INDUSTRIES LIMITED
10 Market Street Brisbane
Queensland 4000 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
CAROMA INDUSTRIES LIMITED
10 Market Street
Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Ian Allan
2 Beaumont Street
Clovelly Park, South Australia 5042 / AU
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2008/41]
Former [2000/14]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7, II Aufgang
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119388.927.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateAU1998PP0620528.09.1998         Original published format: AU PP620598
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990824
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990824
Date:18.07.2001
[2001/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16K1/04
[2000/14]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/15]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ventil[2000/14]
English:A tap[2000/14]
French:Une soupape[2000/14]
Examination procedure03.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/46]
11.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/46]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3820564  (WAGNER W) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB1464724  (BARKING BRASSWARE) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 27 - line 94 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]WO9812460  (CAROMA IND LTD [AU], et al) [AD] 1,4 * abstract *
by applicantAU19990097006