Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990862

EP0990862 - Refrigerator-freezer with two evaporators for respective refrigerating and freezing compartments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 210-0913 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0913 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Niki, Shigeru, c/o Osaka Works, K.K. Toshiba
1-6 Ohtatoshiba-cho
Ibaraki, Osaka / JP
02 / Kusunoki, Atsushi, c/o Osaka Works, K.K. Toshiba
1-6 Ohtatoshiba-cho
Ibaraki, Osaka / JP
03 / Kishimoto, Takuya, c/o Osaka Branch
Toshiba Ave Co., Ltd., 1-6 Ohtatoshiba-cho
Ibaraki, Osaka / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99119445.730.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998028156002.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28156098
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990862
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990862
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25B5/04, F25D11/02, F25B49/02
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kühl-/Tiefkühlgerät mit zwei Verdampfern für jeweils Kühl- und Gefrierraum[2000/14]
English:Refrigerator-freezer with two evaporators for respective refrigerating and freezing compartments[2000/14]
French:Réfrigérateur-Congélateur avec deux évaporateurs respectivement pour chambres de réfrigération et de congélation[2000/14]
Examination procedure27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
29.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2005Fee for grant paid
15.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0246465  (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [X] 1,6 * page 3, line 15 - page 6, line 6; figure 1 * [Y] 2,4,5;
 [YA]US5715693  (VAN DER WALT NICHOLAS R [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 65; figure 1 * [A] 3;
 [Y]US4439998  (HORVAY JULIUS B [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4242116  (ASCHBERGER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 11; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5465591  (CUR NIHAT O [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 47 - line 57; figures 5,7 *