Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993001

EP0993001 - Apparatus for eliminating hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
52425 Jülich / DE
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH
52425 Jülich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bröckerhoff, Peter, Dr.
Meisenweg 8
52428 Jülich / DE
02 / von Lensa, Werner, Dr.
Am Königsbusch 31
52379 Langerwehe / DE
03 / Reinecke, Ernst-Arndt
Lütticher Strasse 23
52064 Aachen / DE
04 / Voswinckel, Moritz
Annunitiatenbach 29
52062 Aachen / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99119477.030.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814605807.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846058
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993001
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993001
Date:09.01.2002
[2002/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993001
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G21C19/317
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [2002/39]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen von Wasserstoff[2000/15]
English:Apparatus for eliminating hydrogen[2000/15]
French:Dispositif pour éliminer de l'hydrogène[2000/15]
Examination procedure14.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
28.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT
18.03.2003Fee for grant paid
18.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.12.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.12.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9839091  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [PAX]WO9936923  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 28; figures 1-3 * * abstract * [X] 7-9;
 [A]DE19722305  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [AX]WO9618218  (YARDNEY TECH PROD [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claim 6 * [X] 7,9;
 [A]DE4221693  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5035875  (DAISH STEPHEN R [GB]) [X] 7-9 * column 1, line 4 - column 2, line 9 *;
 [X]EP0599618  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 7-9 * page 5, line 31FF.; figures 4,6 *;
 [PX]DE19751171  (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE]) [PX] 7-9 * column 5, lines 32-65; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4228132  (WEEMS STERLING J, et al) [A] 7-9 * figures 3,6 *