Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992871

EP0992871 - CMOS circuit for generating a current reference [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Piazza degli Affari, 2
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
TELECOM ITALIA S.p.A.
Piazza degli Affari, 2
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
Telecom Italia Lab S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274
10148 Torino / IT
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A.
Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274
10148 Turin / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Balistreri, Emanuele
Via Briga e Tenda, 7
84091 Battipaglia, (Salerno) / IT
02 / Burzio, Marco
Via Montanaro, 17/1
10059 Grugliasco / IT
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Kanzlei Landshut
Postfach 26 64
84010 Landshut / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton , et al
Lederer, Keller & Riederer, Postfach 26 64
84010 Landshut / DE
Application number, filing date99119497.801.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0083105.10.1998         Original published format: IT TO980831
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992871
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992871
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992871
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/089, G05F3/26
[2000/18]
Former International [2000/15]G05F3/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:CMOS-Schaltung zur Erzeugung einer Stromreferenz[2000/15]
English:CMOS circuit for generating a current reference[2000/15]
French:Circuit CMOS pour générer un courant de référence[2000/15]
Examination procedure09.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2003Fee for grant paid
08.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5331295  (JELINEK JULES J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4442398  (BERTAILS JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4684898  (DHUYVETTER TIMOTHY A [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4645948  (MORRIS BERNARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5157285  (ALLEN MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *